EP1381318 - MULTI-AXIAL UTERINE ARTERY IDENTIFICATION, CHARACTERIZATION, AND OCCLUSION PIVOTING DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vascular Control Systems, Inc. 32236-F Paseo Adelanto San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Vascular Control Systems, Inc. 32236-E Paseo Adelanto San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBANK, Fred 12 Old Ranch Road Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
ALTIERI, Grieg, E. 1102 Temple Hills Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | 03 /
JONES, Michael, L. 6332 Camino Marinero San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725389.7 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US09548 | Priority number, date | US20010279477P | 28.03.2001 Original published format: US 279477 P | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02078521 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381318 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/12 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/2812 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B17/42 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/04] | A61B8/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIAXIALE UTERUSARTERIENIDENTIFIKATION, CHARAKTERISIERUNG UND OKKLUSIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2004/04] | English: | MULTI-AXIAL UTERINE ARTERY IDENTIFICATION, CHARACTERIZATION, AND OCCLUSION PIVOTING DEVICES AND METHODS | [2004/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES PIVOTANTS SERVANT A L'IDENTIFICATION, A LA CARACTERISATION ET A L'OCCLUSION D'UNE ARTERE UTERINE SUR PLUSIEURS AXES | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3063455 (MARKLEY RAYMOND L) [Y] 27-41 * column 1, lines 57-70; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0598579 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-58* the whole document *; | [Y]US5447515 (ROBICSEK FRANCIS [US]) [Y] 25,26,42-58 * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9838486 (ACUSON [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 3, line 8 - line 25; figure 1 * [Y] 25-58 | International search | [Y]US5979453 (SAVAGE GEORGE M [US], et al); | [Y]US6066139 (RYAN THOMAS PATRICK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9838486 |