EP1292232 - HAND-HELD SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS WITH OMNI-CIRCUMFERENTIAL ACTUATION CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2020 W. Main Street, Suite 10 Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY 2020 W. Main Street, Suite 10 Durham, NC 27705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVERAKER, Ronald, F. 2618 Pleasant Green Road Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
TOTH, Cynthia, A. 928 Pinehurst Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27514-3432 / US | 03 /
DODGE, Brian, C. 529 Lakeshore Drive Hillsborough, NC 27278-2025 / US | 04 /
MCCUEN, Brooks, W. 2807 Montgomery Street Durham, NC 27705-5635 / US | 05 /
JAFFE, Glenn, J. 3618 Carlisle Street Durham, NC 27707 / US | 06 /
POSTEL, Eric, A. 3320 Executive Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | 07 /
FEKRAT, Sharon 3914 Chippenham Road Durham, NC 27707 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Tranter, Andrew David, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2013/38] |
Former [2012/23] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP Barnes 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/12] | Butler, Lance Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02725394.7 | 29.03.2002 | [2003/12] | WO2002US09578 | Priority number, date | US20010837555 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 837555 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085220 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292232 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292232 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2913 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2918 (EP,US);
A61B2017/305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTE CHIRUGISCHE INSTRUMENTE MIT BEDIENUNGSMÖGLICHKEITEN VON JEDER SEITE DES UMFANGS | [2003/12] | English: | HAND-HELD SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS WITH OMNI-CIRCUMFERENTIAL ACTUATION CAPABILITIES | [2003/12] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX MANUELS A CAPACITES D' ACTIONNEMENT OMNI-CIRCONFERENTIEL | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 29.03.2013 | LU | 29.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5634918 (RICHARDS WILLIAM D [US]) [DA] 1-32* the whole document * | International search | [AE]US6391046 (OVERAKER RONALD F [US], et al); | [A]DE3526821 (HENSLER EWALD) |