EP1372645 - RECONSTITUTABLE PARENTERAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A COX-2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard, Mail Zone 04E St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard, Mail Zone 04E St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARARLI, Tugrul, T. 1700 Bluestem Lane Glenview, IL 60025 / US | 02 /
NEMA, Sandeep 1526 Oxford Circle Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 03 /
KARIM, Aziz 5225 Greenleaf Skokie, IL 60077 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725471.3 | 02.04.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US10252 | Priority number, date | US20010281058P | 03.04.2001 Original published format: US 281058 P | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02080912 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372645 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372645 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/42, A61K9/19, A61P29/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/18 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/08 (CN,KR);
A61K9/19 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/50 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | 30.09.2003 | LT | 30.09.2003 | LV | 30.09.2003 | MK | 30.09.2003 | RO | 30.09.2003 | SI | 30.09.2003 | Title | German: | AUFLÖSBARES PULVER EINES COX-2 INHIBITORS ZUR PARENTERALEN ANWENDUNG | [2004/01] | English: | RECONSTITUTABLE PARENTERAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING A COX-2 INHIBITOR | [2004/01] | French: | COMPOSITION PARENTERALE CONTENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE COX-2 POUVANT ETRE RECONSTITUEE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 23.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5756546 (PIROTTE BERNARD [BE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 37 - line 42 * * example 16 *; | [A]WO0010993 (PACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 52, line 25 - page 53, line 2 *; | [A] - JAIN K.K., "Evaluation of intravenous parecoxib for the relief of acute post-surgical pain", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, vol. 9, no. 11, pages 2717 - 2723, XP001084308 [A] 1-40 * paragraph [05.1] * * paragraph [06.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.9.11.2717 |