EP1390073 - COMPOSITIONS HAVING ENHANCED PHARMACOKINETIC CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODWARD, David, F. 22736 Islamare Lane Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 02 /
AMBRUS, Gyorgy 12681 Swidler Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725939.9 | 03.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002US14241 | Priority number, date | US20010847935 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 847935 | US20020136240 | 01.05.2002 Original published format: US 136240 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02089853 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390073 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61P27/06 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
A61K47/58 (EP);
A61K31/498 (EP);
A61K47/542 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTEN PHARMAKOKINETISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2004/09] | English: | COMPOSITIONS HAVING ENHANCED PHARMACOKINETIC CHARACTERISTICS | [2004/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AYANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES PHARMACOCINETIQUES AMELIOREES | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2012 | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/10] | 09.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.10.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9744063 (NEUROMEDICA INC [US]) [X] 1-72 * page 19, line 23; claim 1 *; | [PX]US6255502 (PENKLER LAWRENCE JOHN [ZA], et al) [PX] 1 * claim - *; | [PX]US2001056116 (SHASHOUA VICTOR [US]) [PX] 1 * sentence 083; claim 1 *; | [PA]WO0205853 (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US], et al) [PA] 1 * claim - *; | [E]WO02089804 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [E] 1-72* claim - * | Examination | JPH11130656 | US4188393 | US4629621 | EP0305726 | EP0426390 | WO9802187 | US5811443 | WO0044355 | EP1392308 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11130656 A 19990518 (KOSE CORP) |