EP1385841 - SULFONAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHANAK, Dashyant 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
GALLAGHER, Timothy, F. 1250 Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
KNIGHT, Steven, D. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Billson, Siân Catherine GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Hockley, Siân Catherine GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02725952.2 | 07.05.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US14408 | Priority number, date | US20010289306P | 07.05.2001 Original published format: US 289306 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02090353 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385841 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/10, C07D419/10, A61K31/41, A61K31/433, A61P9/00, C07D413/12, C07D207/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D417/12 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D207/12 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | C07D403/10, C07D419/10, A61K31/41, A61K31/433, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFONAMIDE | [2004/06] | English: | SULFONAMIDES | [2004/06] | French: | SULFONAMIDES | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 03.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9938845 (TULARIK INC [US]); | [A]WO9802708 (REMINGTON ARMS CO INC [US]) |