EP1389108 - METHODS FOR SELECTIVE IMMUNOMODULATION USING PIMECROLIMUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBOUT, Salah-Dine 5, route de Mulhouse F-68720 Tagolsheim / FR | 02 /
CORDIER, Andre Schweizergatz 33 CH-4045 Basel / CH | 03 /
KEHREN, Jeanne 1, rue des Abeilles F-68490 Bantzenheim / FR | 04 /
MOORE, Henrietta, Denise Buchengasse 27 Breitenfurt bei Wien / AT | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/08] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02725977.9 | 09.05.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002US14637 | Priority number, date | US20010289843P | 09.05.2001 Original published format: US 289843 P | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02089796 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389108 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/436, A61K45/06, A61P1/00, A61P11/06, A61P29/00, A61P37/02 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN IMMUNOMODULIERUNG MIT PIMECROLIMUS | [2004/08] | English: | METHODS FOR SELECTIVE IMMUNOMODULATION USING PIMECROLIMUS | [2004/08] | French: | PROCEDES D'IMMUNOMODULATION SELECTIVE UTILISANT PIMECROLIMUS | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP06001197.0 / EP1649856 | Request for further processing for: | 17.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1064942 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,20-53 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 25 * * page 7, line 12 - line 14 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 15 * * example 8 *; | [X]WO0126605 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,20-53 * page 1, line 6 - line 9 * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 11 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 3 * * page 10, line 11 - line 14 * * page 11, line 30 - line 34 * * page 21, line 6 - line 16 * * page 22, line 1 - page 23, line 17 * * claims 1,4,8 *; | [DX]US6004973 (GUITARD PATRICE [FR], et al) [DX] 1,5,6,20,51 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 1, line 53 - line 54 * * column 2, line 22 - line 29 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 55 * * column 6, line 19 - line 39 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 42 * * examples 5-7 * * column 10, line 11 - line 20 *; | [A]WO9631514 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-8,11-13,19-53 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 5 * * page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 4 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 5 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * examples 1,3-7,9-19,21-26 * * page 22, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,9-11 *; | [A]WO9506649 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4-8,11,20-31,33,34,36-43,45,46,48-52 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraphs 1,3 * * claims 1,9 *; | [DPX]WO0190110 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DPX] 1,2,5,6,20,21,51,52 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * claims 3-5 * | [XA] - WELLINGTON KERI ET AL, "SDZ ASM 981.", BIODRUGS, (200012), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 1173-8804, pages 409 - 416, XP008008793 [X] 1,5,6,20,30,33,39-42,45,51 * abstract * * page 410, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 411, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * * page 411, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 412, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 414, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 415, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 415, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 24-29,36-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200014060-00005 | [X] - RAPPERSBERGER K ET AL, "Oral SDZ ASM 981: Safety, pharmacokinetics and efficacy in patients with moderate to severe chronic plaque psoriasis.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, 61st Annual Meeting of the Society for Investigative Dermatology.;Chicago, Illinois, USA; May 10-14, 2000, (200004), vol. 114, no. 4, ISSN 0022-202X, page 776, XP008008802 [X] 1,5,6,20,30,33,39,45,48,51 * the whole document * | [XA] - HARPER J ET AL, "First experience of topical SDZ ASM 981 in children with atopic dermatitis.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (200104), vol. 144, no. 4, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 781 - 787, XP008008795 [X] 1,5,6,20,30,33,39-42,45,51 * abstract * * page 781, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 785, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 786, column 2, paragraph 2 * [A] 8,24-28,36-38,48-50 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.2001.04133.x | [A] - Dorland's illustrated medical dictionary - Edition 24, PHILADELPHIA AND LONDON, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, (1967), XP002219801 [A] * page 504, column 2, paragraph 8 - page 505, column 1, paragraph 1 * | Examination | WO03035068 | WO03057249 |