EP1370916 - APPLICATION OF A SWITCHABLE DATA NETWORK FOR REAL TIME AND NON-REAL TIME COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKE, Michael Naturbadstr. 2 a 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KIESEL, Martin Jahnstr. 36 91099 Poxdorf / DE | 03 /
ROSSI, Gernot Kaltenhofstr. 12 91245 Simmelsdorf / DE | [2003/51] | Application number, filing date | 02726058.7 | 11.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002DE00851 | Priority number, date | DE2001113398 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113398 | DE2001147421 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10147421 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02075465 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1370916 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370916 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, H04L29/06 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP,US);
H04L12/417 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31137 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31186 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33216 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33219 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [2006/26] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN EINES SCHALTBAREN DATENNETZES FÜR ECHTZEIT- UND NICHTECHTZEITKOMMUNIKATION | [2003/51] | English: | APPLICATION OF A SWITCHABLE DATA NETWORK FOR REAL TIME AND NON-REAL TIME COMMUNICATION | [2003/51] | French: | APPLICATIONS D'UN RESEAU DE DONNEES COMMUTABLE POUR COMMUNICATION EN TEMPS REEL ET NON REEL | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9414255 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 11; claim 1 *; | [X]DE19758203 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US6032208 (NIXON MARK [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 17, line 53 - column 21, line 36 *; | [Y]WO0028400 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 8* page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 14 *; | [A]US6104696 (KADAMBI SHIRI [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]WO0105120 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 18 - line 23 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y] - MONTEIRO F ET AL, "Teleoperating a mobile robot. A solution based on JAVA language", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 1997. ISIE '97., PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON GUIMARAES, PORTUGAL 7-11 JULY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970707), ISBN 0-7803-3936-3, pages SS263 - SS267, XP010265177 [Y] 3,4 * page 265, column L, line 12 - line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.1997.651773 |