EP1379568 - CELLULAR POLYISOCYANATE POLYADDITION PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLLMANN, Heinz Heeker Strasse 82 49594 Alfhausen / DE | 02 /
WAGNER, Hermann, Dietrich Via M. d'Azegillo I-20062 1 Gropello d'Adda / IT | 03 /
STRAUSS, Michael Fuchspass 13 49448 Lemförde / DE | 04 /
JESCHKE, Torsten Auf dem Lohfelde 38 49152 Wimmer / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 02726228.6 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002EP03501 | Priority number, date | DE2001117089 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117089 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081537 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379568 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1379568 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/42, C08G18/76 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C08G18/7678 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0066 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLIGE POLYISOCYANAT-POLYADDITIONSPRODUKTE | [2004/03] | English: | CELLULAR POLYISOCYANATE POLYADDITION PRODUCTS | [2004/03] | French: | PRODUITS DE POLYADDITION POLYISOCYANATE CELLULAIRES | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2011
17.05.2011
ADMISSIBLE Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US Opponent's representative Van den Broeck, Kristel Alice, et al, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [2011/48] |
Former [2011/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2011
17.05.2011
ADMISSIBLE Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US Opponent's representative Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | 01.07.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.01.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/14] | Appeal following opposition | 13.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0375/14 | 22.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 29.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | AT | 28.03.2011 | GB | 28.03.2011 | LU | 28.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 25.08.2010 | |
PT | 27.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03195717 ; | [XA]DE3614038 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 38 * * page 8, line 20 - line 34 * * examples 2,4,6B; tables 1,2 * [A] 6,7; | [X]US4778830 (STREU JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 * examples 1-3,13-15; tables I-III *; | [AD]DE19548771 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1,3-10 * page 5, line 56 - page 9, line 14 ** examples 1,2A; table 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911120), vol. 015, no. 456, Database accession no. (C - 0886), & JP03195717 A 19910827 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0178562 | DE3613650 | DE3614038 | DE4318979 | DE19548771 | DE19809634 | DE19821668 | DE19821666 | DE19954500 | DE10004328 |