EP1466266 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSFORMING AN XML DOCUMENT ACCORDING TO A SUBSET OF XML GRAMMAR RULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASSIN, Amr. F., Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ALSAFADI, Yasser, Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02726399.5 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002IB02395 | Priority number, date | US20010894103 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: US 894103 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03003240 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466266 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G06F40/16 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/149 (EP,US);
G06F40/151 (EP,US);
G06F40/154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRANSFORMIERUNG EINES XML-DOKUMENTS ANHAND EINER UNTERMENGE VON XML GRAMMATIK-REGELN | [2004/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSFORMING AN XML DOCUMENT ACCORDING TO A SUBSET OF XML GRAMMAR RULES | [2004/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSFORMATION D'UN DOCUMENT XML EN AU MOINS UN DOCUMENT XML STRUCTURE SELON UN SOUS-ENSEMBLE D'UN ENSEMBLE DE REGLES DE GRAMMAIRE XML | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 08.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2346238 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,10,17 * abstract * * page 6 - page 7 *; | [X]WO0056033 (ORACLE CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 4 * * page 10, line 6 - line 23 * * page 11, line 5 - line 26 *; | [A] - ANDRIVET ET AL, "A SIMPLE XML PARSER", C/C++ USERS JOURNAL, R&D PUBLICATIONS, LAWRENCE, KS,, US, (199907), vol. 17, no. 7, ISSN 1075-2838, pages 22,24,26 - 28,30,32, XP008015172 [A] 1,10,17 * the whole document * |