EP1405559 - MATERIALS FOR FEEDING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURAUCHI, Masahiko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Global F. & A. Acids Co., 1-15-1 Kyobashi, Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | 02 /
FURUTA, Kiyonori, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Hiroyuki, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc. AminoScience Lab., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02726454.8 | 22.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002JP04934 | Priority number, date | JP20010209284 | 10.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001209284 | [2004/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007702 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405559 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/015 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01K1/0152 (EP,US);
A01K1/0157 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | TIERFUTTERMITTEL | [2004/15] | English: | MATERIALS FOR FEEDING ANIMALS | [2004/15] | French: | MATIERES POUR ALIMENTATION ANIMALE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2004 | Translation filed | 07.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 09.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YP]JP2001340378 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [YP]JP2002069843 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [A]EP1100552 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2000152728 (YOSHIOKA TSUTOMU); | [A]JPH08140514 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPH0739393U | by applicant | JPS6457931 |