EP1391896 - ELECTRIC WIRE COATED WITH POLYVINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION AND CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | For all designated states TAISEI CORPORATION 1-25-1 Nishi-shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0606 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | ||
For all designated states Taisei Corporation 1-25-1 Nishi-shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kiyoshi c/o Hitachi Cable, Ltd. 1-1,Hidaka-Cho 5-Chome Hitachi-Shi, Ibaraki 319-1414 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Hiroyuki c/o Hitachi Cable,Ltd. 1-1,Hidaka-Cho 5-Chome Hitachi-Shi, Ibaraki 319-1414 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Misako, c/o TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 650, Mitsuzawa, Hosaka-Cho Nirasaki-Shi, Yamanashi 407-0192 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Teruyuki, c/o TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 650, Mitsuzawa, Hosaka-Cho Nirasaki-Shi, Yamanashi 407-0192 / JP | 05 /
HIRAYAMA, Naoya, c/o TOKYO ELECTRON TOHOKU LIMITED 2-41, Machiya 1-Chome, Shiroyama-Machi Tsukui-Gun, Kanagawa 220-0101 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Sadao, c/o TAISEI CORPORATION 25-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 163-0606 / JP | 07 /
WAKAYAMA, Yoshihide, c/o TAISEI CORPORATION 25-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 163-0606 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02726476.1 | 23.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002JP05020 | Priority number, date | JP20010160047 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001160047 | [2004/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02097830 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391896 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/02, C08L27/06 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
H01B3/443 (EP,US);
H01B7/02 (KR);
C08K5/098 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L27/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER LEITER UND KABEL MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG AUS EINER POLYVINYLCHLORIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/09] | English: | ELECTRIC WIRE COATED WITH POLYVINYL CHLORIDE RESIN COMPOSITION AND CABLE | [2004/09] | French: | FIL ELECTRIQUE REVETU D'UNE COMPOSITION DE RESINE DE CHLORURE DE POLYVINYLE ET CABLE | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2003 | Translation filed | 28.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]EP1039481 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]); | [Y]US6155922 (KOBAYASHI SADAO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH09324088 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPS51155378U |