EP1423694 - METHOD FOR TESTING A BEVERAGE FOR ILLICIT SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guerra, Francisco Javier 9715 W. Broward Blvd 217 Plantation, FL 33324 / US | For all designated states Glover, Brian 22 Saints Orchid Rd Belle Terre, NY 11777 / US | For all designated states McCafferty, James S. T. 6732 NW 20th Ave Forth Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02726863.0 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US15088 | Priority number, date | US20010945908 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: US 945908 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021254 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1423694 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
G01N33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINES GETRÄNKES AUF UNERLAUBTE SUBSTANZEN | [2004/23] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING A BEVERAGE FOR ILLICIT SUBSTANCES | [2004/23] | French: | PROCEDE CONCU POUR TESTER UNE BOISSON POUR DETECTER DES SUBSTANCES ILLICITES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/15] | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2006 | 31.05.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6153147 (CRAIG JAMES J [US]) [X] 1-19 * figures 17-25 * * examples 1,2 * * column 4, line 22 - line 31 *; | [XP]US2001046710 (CUTLER CHARLYNE E [US]) [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * | [X] - M. CAPEHART, "A condom for your drink", LAS VEGAS CITY LIFE, (20020617), URL: http://www.lasvegascitylife.com/archives/index.inn?loc=detail&doc=/2002/June/13-2237-ion2%20ghb.txt, (20020830), XP002211716 [X] 1-19 * the whole document * |