EP1377254 - COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING AN ISOFLAVONE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLINAT, Stefan Martin-Niemöller-Strasse 13 22880 Wedel / DE | 02 /
VENZKE, Kirsten Novalisweg 27 22303 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
HERPENS, Andreas Steinburger Strasse 5B 21465 Reinbek / DE | 04 /
BIERGIESSER, Helga Sandweg 16 21465 Reinbek / DE | 05 /
STÄB, Franz Bäckerstrasse 3 21379 Echem / DE | [2004/02] | Application number, filing date | 02727450.5 | 21.03.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002EP03162 | Priority number, date | DE2001114305 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114305 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02076409 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377254 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE UND DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT EINEM GEHALT AN ISOFLAVONEN | [2004/02] | English: | COSMETIC AND DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING AN ISOFLAVONE CONTENT | [2004/02] | French: | PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES ET DERMATOLOGIQUES CONTENANT DES ISOFLAVONES | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4432947 (NEW STANDARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 2; example 2; claims 1-17 *; | [X]JPH10226642 ; | [X]JPH09157156 ; | [X]JPH0196126 ; | [X]JPH02193919 ; | [X]WO9947118 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 9 - page 8, line 28; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO9948496 (NOVOGEN RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * example 8; claims 1-5,13,15 *; | [X]WO9808503 (NOVOGEN RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 7; claims 1,2 *; | [PX]FR2803747 (PHARMASCIENCE LAB [FR]) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-6,8-10,14,15,18-22 *; | [E]EP1234572 (MIBELLE AG COSMETICS [CH]) [E] 1-10 * examples 10,11; claims 1-5 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 44, Database accession no. 1998-515072, XP002227657 & JPH10226642 A 19980825 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 34, Database accession no. 1997-369370, XP002227658 & JPH09157156 A 19970617 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 21, Database accession no. 1989-155044, XP002227659 & JPH0196126 A 19890414 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900101), vol. 14, no. 470, Database accession no. (C - 0769), & JP02193919 A 19900731 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * |