EP1412932 - LANGUAGE LEARNING SYSTEM AND A DIGITAL STORAGE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANAKO CORPORATION Eurocity Joukahaisenkatu 1 (4.krs) 20520 Turku / FI | [2013/16] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states SANAKO CORPORATION Kaurakatu 46 20740 Turku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMINEN, Eero Kirkkotie 3 D 3 FIN-21450 Tarvasjoki / FI | 02 /
SAARNI, Timo Tammelininkatu 7 as 22 FIN-20380 Turku / FI | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/16] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2004/18] | Äkräs, Tapio Juhani Kolster Oy Ab,P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02727627.8 | 31.05.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002FI00468 | Priority number, date | FI20010001159 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: FI 20011159 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02097766 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412932 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412932 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/08 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G09B17/00 (EP,US);
G09B19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | LT | 12.12.2003 | LV | 12.12.2003 | Title | German: | SPRACHENLERNSYSTEM UND DIGITALE SPEICHEREINHEIT | [2004/18] | English: | LANGUAGE LEARNING SYSTEM AND A DIGITAL STORAGE UNIT | [2004/18] | French: | SYSTEME D'APPRENTISSAGE LINGUISTIQUE ET UNITE DE STOCKAGE NUMERIQUE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.08.2008 | Appeal received No. T2176/08 | 15.10.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.06.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 28.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | IE | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | LU | 31.05.2013 | FR | 17.06.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | DE | 03.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 17.06.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 17.06.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
DE | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0400682 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]WO9903083 (PARK KYU JIN [KR], et al); | [AP]EP1168277 (YEH HAO MING [TW]) |