EP1502241 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING WARM PREPACKAGED FOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martinelli, Mara Viale Repubblica, 9 41090 Sassuolo / IT | For all designated states Martinelli, Maria Christina Viale Rieter, 44 41100 Modena / IT | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinelli Mara Viale Republica 9 41090 Sassuolo / IT | 02 /
Martinelli, Maria Cristina Viale Rieter 44 41100 Modena / IT | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Crugnola, Pietro Luppi Crugnola Bergamini & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 02727844.9 | 08.05.2002 | [2005/05] | WO2002IB01543 | Priority number, date | IT2001MO00085 | 08.05.2001 Original published format: IT MO20010085 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02091317 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502241 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/10, H05B6/80, A47G29/14 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
G07F11/54 (EP,US);
G07F17/0071 (EP,US);
G07F17/0078 (EP,US);
H05B6/808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | G07F9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/05] | Title | German: | AUTOMAT UND METHODE ZUM VERKAUF VON WARMEN, ABGEPACKTEN SPEISEN | [2005/05] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING WARM PREPACKAGED FOODS | [2005/05] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES CUISINES CHAUDS | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2007 | Decision despatched | 20.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2008 | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3412900 (TEPRO PRAEZISIONSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2597239 (CASTEL ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5522310 (BLACK SR GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5590809 (PRESCOTT JACK R [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | Examination | US4431888 |