EP1435799 - APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY PASTEURIZING MEAT AND FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINTECO IMPIANTI S.R.L. Via trento, 106 20099 Sesto San Giovanni / IT | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCK, Adam Via Cavour, 3 I-20048 Carate Brianza / IT | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02728035.3 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002IT00224 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02159 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012159 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032757 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435799 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435799 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/04, A23L3/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
A23B4/0056 (EP,US);
A23L3/02 (EP,US);
A23L3/04 (EP,US);
A23L3/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN PASTEURISIEREN VON FLEISCH UND NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2004/43] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUSLY PASTEURIZING MEAT AND FOOD PRODUCTS | [2004/29] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT LA PASTEURISATION CONTINUE DE PRODUITS CARNES ET ALIMENTAIRES | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/29] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN PASTEURISIEREN VON FLEISCH UND NAHRUNGSMITTEL | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | GB | 09.04.2009 | IE | 09.04.2009 | LU | 09.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 09.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.04.2009 | ||
LU | 09.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 09.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
GB | 09.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 09.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010667 (HEROLD JAMES L, et al) [X] 1-21 * pages 1-3; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2333544 (MEYER GEORGE J); | [X]US3868897 (MOREAU CLAUDE) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 23; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4490401 (BECKER KENNETH W [US], et al); | [A]WO9602626 (SANDER HANSEN A S [DK], et al) [A] 1-21 * claim - *; | [A]EP0760214 (NESTLE SA [CH]) |