EP1381290 - VARIABLE-CAPACITY STORE FOR ELONGATED ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2005/52] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPATAFORA, Mario Via del Lavoro, 56 I-40100 Bologna / IT | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2004/04] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02728045.2 | 17.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002IT00240 | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00227 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: IT BO20010227 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085144 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381290 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381290 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1381290 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35, B65G47/51 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
B65G47/5122 (EP,US);
A24C5/35 (EP,US);
B65G2207/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIIERBARE KAPAZITÄTSPEICHER FÜR LÄNGLICHE OBJEKTE | [2004/04] | English: | VARIABLE-CAPACITY STORE FOR ELONGATED ELEMENTS | [2004/04] | French: | MAGASIN A CAPACITE VARIABLE DESTINE A DES ELEMENTS DE FORME ALLONGEE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 03.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/38] | BE | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BE | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | BE | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1497340 (EGYESUELT IZZOLAMPA) [X] 1 * page 2, line 101 - page 3, line 29; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0738478 (GD SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US6065585 (BRYANT LEONARD JAMES [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 24 - line 47; figure 3 * |