EP1479016 - RIGHTS MANAGEMENT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOHO, Masahiro 3-14-531, Miyukihigashimachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0055 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Ryuichi 4-36-309-B502, Sengokunishimachi Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0014 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Masaya 7-41, Higashimakino-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1151 / JP | 04 /
UESAKA, Yasushi 2-16-16, Tsutsujigaokakita Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1348 / JP | 05 /
TOKUDA, Katsumi 1-13-2, Soen Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0038 / JP | 06 /
INOUE, Mitsuhiro 3-12-19, Takejima, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555-0011 / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02728170.8 | 28.05.2002 | [2004/48] | WO2002JP05142 | Priority number, date | JP20010160290 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001160290 | JP20010224413 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001224413 | JP20010291593 | 25.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001291593 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02097693 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479016 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/48] | Title | German: | EINHEIT ZUR VERWALTUNG VON RECHTEN | [2004/48] | English: | RIGHTS MANAGEMENT UNIT | [2004/48] | French: | UNITE DE GESTION DES DROITS | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2009 | 11.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/32] | 18.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5845281 (BENSON GREG [SE], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 17 - column 8, line 26 ** column 11, line 9 - column 13, line 5 *; | [XA]WO0059150 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10,13-17,22 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 10 * * page 10, line 3 - page 20, line 3 * * page 21, line 1 - page 35, line 22 * * page 39, line 25 - page 46, line 12 * [A] 7,11,12,18-21; | [A]US6170060 (MOTT TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 10 - line 20 * * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 65 * * column 7, line 65 - column 9, line 57 * * column 10, line 59 - column 13, line 58 * |