EP1511274 - TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Change - withdrawal | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Takashi, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02728219.3 | 31.05.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002JP05401 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03103253 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1511274 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04M1/58 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H04M1/58 (EP,US);
H04M1/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | SENDER-EMPFÄNGER | [2005/09] | English: | TRANSMITTER-RECEIVER | [2005/09] | French: | EMETTEUR/RECEPTEUR | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2004 | Translation filed | 20.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/21] | 24.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0937380 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH07240782 (SONY CORP) |