EP1373278 - METALLOAMIDE AND AMINOSILANE PRECURSORS FOR CVD FORMATION OF DIELECTRIC THIN FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUM, Thomas, H. 2 Handol Lane New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US | 02 /
XU, Chongying 8 Heather Court New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 03 /
HENDRIX, Bryan, C. 12 Peace Street Danbury, CT 06810 / US | 04 /
ROEDER, Jeffrey, F. 4 Longmeadow Hill Road Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea, et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr., et al Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02728580.8 | 27.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US09390 | Priority number, date | US20010823196 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: US 823196 | US20010954831 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: US 954831 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02079211 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373278 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3205, C07F7/00, C07F7/02, C07F7/10, C07F7/28, C23C8/00, H01L21/4763, H01L21/31, H01L21/469 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/28185 (EP,US);
C07F7/00 (KR);
C07F7/003 (EP,US);
C07F7/025 (EP,US);
C07F7/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C16/401 (EP,US);
C23C16/405 (EP,US);
H01L21/02142 (EP,US);
H01L21/02148 (EP,US);
H01L21/02164 (EP,US);
H01L21/02181 (EP,US);
H01L21/02219 (EP,US);
H01L21/02222 (EP,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,US);
H01L21/28194 (EP,US);
H01L21/3125 (US);
H01L21/31604 (US);
H01L21/3185 (US);
H01L21/02205 (EP);
H01L21/0228 (EP);
H01L21/28167 (EP,US);
H01L29/517 (EP,US);
H01L29/518 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | C07F7/00, C07F7/02, C07F7/10, C07F7/28, C23C8/00, H01L21/3205, H01L21/4763, H01L21/31, H01L21/469 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLOAMID- UND AMINOSILANVORSTUFEN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG DÜNNER DIELEKTRISCHER FILME DURCH CHEMISCHE ABSCHEIDUNG AUS DER GASPHASE | [2004/01] | English: | METALLOAMIDE AND AMINOSILANE PRECURSORS FOR CVD FORMATION OF DIELECTRIC THIN FILMS | [2004/01] | French: | PRECURSEURS DE METALLOAMIDE ET AMINOSILANE UTILISES DANS LA FORMATION PAR PROCEDE CVD DE FILMS MINCES DE DIELECTRIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5252518 (SANDHU GURTEJ S [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16,19,39 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X] - CHEON, JINWOO ET AL, "Gas Phase Photoproduction of Diatomic Metal Nitrides During Metal Nitride Laser Chemical Vapor Deposition", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY ( 1999 ), 38(9), 2238-2239 CODEN: INOCAJ; ISSN: 0020-1669, (19990415), XP002431398 [X] 1-11,16,19,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic981365b | [X] - BAXTER D V ET AL, "MOLECULAR ROUTES TO METAL CARBIDES, NITRIDES, AND OXIDES. 2. STUDIES OF THE AMMONOLYSIS OF METAL DIALKYLAMIDES AND HEXAMETHYLDISILYLAMIDES", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19960601), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 1222 - 1228, XP000626878 [X] 1-11,16,19,39 * page 1223 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm950499+ | [PX] - OHSHITA, Y. ET AL, "HfO2 growth by low-pressure chemical vapor deposition using the Hf(N(C2H5)2)4/O2 gas system", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH , 233(1-2), 292-297 CODEN: JCRGAE; ISSN: 0022-0248, (2001), XP004300609 [PX] 1-11,16,19,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(01)01502-0 | International search | [X]US5139825 (GORDON ROY G [US], et al); | [X]US5252518 (SANDHU GURTEJ S [US], et al); | [X]JPH0680413 (MARUYAMA TOSHIRO); | [X]US5424095 (CLARK TERENCE [US], et al); | [X]US5593741 (IKEDA YASUO [JP]); | [X]US6159855 (VAARTSTRA BRIAN A [US]) |