Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1353615 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0100088 | 12.01.2001 | SE0200018 | 09.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02054995 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0100088 | 12.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE0100088L | 13.07.2002 | L | SE0100088D0 | 12.01.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0100088 | 12.01.2001 |