EP1353615 - TRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLSSON, Lennart Rönnbergagatan 5 723 46 Västeras / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Olsson, Lennart Rönnbergagatan 5 723 46 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm Aros Patent AB, P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 02729600.3 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002SE00018 | Priority number, date | SE20010000088 | 12.01.2001 Original published format: SE 0100088 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02054995 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353615 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/04 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
A61F5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2003/43] | English: | TRACTION DEVICE | [2003/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRACTION | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4941464 ; | [A] - LEWIS A. STIMSON, M.D., "An easy method of reducing dislocations of the shoulder and the hip", MEDICAL RECORD, (198903), vol. 57, pages 356 - 357, XP002959089 |