17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
01.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
27.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
07.09.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
01.12.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
24.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.07.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.07.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] |
02.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] |
07.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|