EP1405410 - FREQUENCY-TUNABLE RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPCOS AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖMMER, Ralph Hohenbrunner Strasse 36 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
STÖMMER, Ralph Hohenbrunner Str. 36 85579 Neubiberg / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02729900.7 | 21.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002DE01836 | Priority number, date | DE2001132181 | 03.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132181 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005576 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405410 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405410 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03H3/04, H03H9/17 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H03H9/175 (EP,US);
H03H3/04 (EP,US);
H03H9/171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/41] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FREQUENZABSTIMMBARER RESONATOR | [2004/15] | English: | FREQUENCY-TUNABLE RESONATOR | [2004/15] | French: | RESONATEUR POUVANT ETRE SYNTONISE EN FREQUENCE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 04.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 10.10.2007 | IT | 31.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2009/03] | GB | 10.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS5895221 ; | [A]US4719383 (WANG JIN S [US], et al); | [A]US5801476 (STURZEBECHER DANA J [US], et al) |