Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7416736 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2008 | B2 | US2004171600 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100822676B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2008 | B1 | KR20030081410 | 17.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002302387B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1367894 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2008 | B1 | EP1367894 | 10.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0207849 | 23.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2436239 | 02.10.2012 | C | CA2436239 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2768005 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | CA2436239 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2768012 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | CA2436239 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60226708D1 | 03.07.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1367894T | 22.09.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA006167 | 27.10.2005 | B1 | EA200300975 | 26.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1065682 | 04.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0303462 | 28.11.2005 | A3 | HUP0303462 | 01.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL157752 | 31.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA03008091 | 12.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO330536B | 09.05.2011 | B1 | NO20033935L | 05.11.2003 | L | NO20033935D0 | 05.09.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ528466 | 26.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL204663B | 29.01.2010 | B1 | PL363567 | 29.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK287813B | 04.10.2011 | B6 | SK12252003 | 02.03.2004 | A3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | EP0202368 | 04.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02076209 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2003 | A3 | WO02076209 | 03.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100858023B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2008 | B1 | KR20080023767 | 14.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002265310 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE395829T | 15.06.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100339003C | 26.09.2007 | C | CN1792149 | 28.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101081027B | 02.06.2010 | B | CN101081027 | 05.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1286371C | 29.11.2006 | C | CN1494379 | 05.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20032652 | 18.02.2004 | A3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2306767T | 16.11.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1090805 | 05.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1112812 | 19.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL209038B | 29.07.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200306927 | 06.09.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2001061158 | 06.03.2001 |