Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 22.09.2004 | BE | Lapse: 22.09.2004 | CH | Lapse: 22.09.2004 | CY | Lapse: 31.05.2005 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 22.12.2004 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 22.12.2004 | IE | | IT | | LI | Lapse: 22.09.2004 | LU | Lapse: 31.05.2005 | MC | Lapse: 31.05.2005 | NL | Lapse: 22.09.2004 | PT | Lapse: 22.02.2005 | SE | | TR | | Examination procedure | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 22.09.2004 | Opposition procedure | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 |