Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
11.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
10.09.2004 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
10.09.2004 | Change - classification | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
04.08.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
04.08.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
09.06.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.01.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
19.01.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
13.01.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.12.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.11.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.12.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication |