06.06.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
12.02.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.09.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
07.09.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.01.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
22.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
30.12.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
28.10.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
25.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
17.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
15.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|