Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006054695 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0205277 | 30.05.2002 | JP2002121286 | 23.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002304104 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2003 | A8 | AU2002304104 | 10.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0205277 | 30.05.2002 | JP2002121286 | 23.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1503327 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2005 | A4 | EP1503327 | 02.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0205277 | 30.05.2002 | JP2002121286 | 23.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03091944 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002121286 | 23.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3534250B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2004 | B2 | JP2003317051 | 07.11.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002121286 | 23.04.2002 |