EP1511363 - ORGANIC FIELD EMISSION DEVICE AND EMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIBASHI, Tadashi Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Shinichiro Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Naoyuki Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
ICHIMURA, Mari Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
YAMADA, Jiro Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2011/46] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
ISHIBASHI, Tadashi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
TAMURA, Shinichiro, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
UEDA, Naoyuki, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
04 /
ICHIMURA, Mari, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMADA, Jiro, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02730838.6 | 31.05.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002JP05366 | Priority number, date | JP20020111659 | 15.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002111659 | JP20020138212 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002138212 | [2005/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088721 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1511363 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, H01L51/50 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H05B33/14 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | H05B33/14, H05B33/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE FELDEMISSIONSVORRICHTUNG UND FELDEMISSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2005/09] | English: | ORGANIC FIELD EMISSION DEVICE AND EMISSION DEVICE | [2005/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ORGANIQUE A EMISSION DE CHAMP ET DISPOSITIF D'EMISSION | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2002 | Translation filed | 27.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63264692 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1,2,5-13 * abstract *; | [XI]EP0967834 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-13 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021] - [0027] - [0044]; example 1 * * claims 1-8 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US6203933 (NAKAYA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * column 33, line 11 - column 37, line 36 * [I] 3; | [XI]US2001033945 (ISHIBASHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-13 * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0037] - [0049] *[I] 3,4 | International search | [A]JPH02250292 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPH02291696 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPH08311442 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JPH10270166 (MORI TATSUO, et al); | [Y]JP2000012226 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2001052870 (TDK CORP) | by applicant | EP0967834 | US6203933 |