19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
04.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
02.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
24.07.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
24.07.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
08.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.06.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.08.2007 |
First examination report |
|
25.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
05.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
30.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
24.01.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
28.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
11.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|