EP1379698 - MOBILITY-MODIFIED NUCLEOBASE POLYMERS AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Biosystems, LLC 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2009/35] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Applied Biosystems, LLC 5781 Van Allen Way Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOO, Sam, L. 450 Carlos Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
GRAHAM, Ron 115 Enchanterd Way San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 03 /
TIAN, Jing 1303 Snow Street Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/03] | 01 /
WOO, Sam, L. 450 Carlos Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | ||
02 /
GRAHAM, Ron 3240 El Suyo Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | |||
03 /
TIAN, Jing 1303 Snow Street Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02731376.6 | 15.04.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002US11824 | Priority number, date | US20010836704 | 16.04.2001 Original published format: US 836704 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02083954 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379698 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1379698 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H19/00, C07H21/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04, G01N33/53, A61K38/00, A61K9/127, C07K5/00, C07K7/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US);
C07H21/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6813, C12Q2565/137, C12Q2525/197 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILITÄTSMODIFIZIERTE NUKLEOBASENPOLYMERE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2004/03] | English: | MOBILITY-MODIFIED NUCLEOBASE POLYMERS AND METHODS OF USING SAME | [2004/03] | French: | POLYMERES DE NUCLEOBASE A MOBILITE MODIFIEE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DES MEMES | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 16.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | LU | 15.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
LU | 15.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
SE | 26.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1218721 (BAYER AG) [X] 28 * compounds h and k *; | [X] - HERDEWIJN P ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDES PART XXXII. SYNTHESIS OF 2'-5' CONNECTED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES PRODRUGS FOR ANTIVIRAL AND ANTITUMORAL NUCLEOSIDES", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1989), vol. 72, no. 8, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1739 - 1748, XP002424721 [X] 1-3,5-11,13,16 * page 1742, compound 30; page 1748, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19890720811 | [X] - KUIJPERS W H H ET AL, "A NEW STRATEGY FOR THE SOLID-PHASE SYNTHESIS OF 5'-THIOLATED OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDES", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19931119), vol. 49, no. 47, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 10931 - 10944, XP000673488 [X] 1,3,5-9,13,14,23,28 * page 10933, compound 4; page 10934, compounds 6a and b; page 10935, compound 8; page 10937, compound 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)80247-7 | [X] - SEELIG B ET AL, "Site-Specific Modification of Enzymatically Synthesized RNA: Transcription Initiation and Diels-Alder Reaction", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971103), vol. 38, no. 44, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7729 - 7732, XP004093407 [X] 28 * page 7730, compound 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)10151-4 | [X] - CONNOLLY B A, "SOLID PHASE 5' PHOSPHORYLATION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 463 - 466, XP002424722 [X] 28 * page 463, figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95757-5 | [X] - L.I. MIZRAKH AND L. YU. POLONSKAYA, "Reactions of alkyl tetraalkylphosphorodiamidites with N-(-hydroxyethyl)acetamide", J. GEN. CHEM. USSR, (1975), vol. 45, page 2301, XP009080599 [X] 28,29 * page 2301, compound (I) * | [X] - VERHEIJEN J C ET AL, "2',5'-OLIGOADENYLATE-PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACIDS (2-5A-PNAS) ACTIVATE RNASE L", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (1999), vol. 7, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 449 - 455, XP000884727 [X] 1-3,5-9,11,26-28 * page 40, figure 1; page 451, compounds 2-4, 7 and 9; page 452, compounds 13-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(98)00258-2 | [X] - SQUIRE RUMNEY, IV AND ERIC T. KOOL, "Structural optimisation of non-nucleotide loop replacements for duplex and triplex DNAs", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, pages 5635 - 5646, XP002424723 [X] 18-20,23,24,26-28 * page 5636, figure 1; page 5637, figure 3; page 5644, figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00126a004 | International search | [X]US5470705 (GROSSMAN PAUL D [US], et al); | [X]US5703222 (GROSSMAN PAUL DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US5807682 (GROSSMAN PAUL DAVID [US], et al); | [XE]US6087325 (MEERS PAUL R [US], et al); | [Y]US6143716 (MEERS PAUL R [US], et al); | [XP]US6339069 (MEERS PAUL R [US], et al) |