EP1387687 - NOVEL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAY, Douglas, William, Pierre 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
SANGER, Gareth J. New Frontiers Science Park South, Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 03 /
YAMADA, Tadataka 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Rutter, Keith, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Rutter, Keith, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02731870.8 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US15911 | Priority number, date | GB20010012208 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: GB 0112208 | GB20010029268 | 06.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129268 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02094187 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387687 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61P1/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4545 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | A61K31/535 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 27.10.2003 | Title | German: | NEUE VERWENDUNG | [2004/07] | English: | NOVEL USE | [2004/07] | French: | NOUVELLE UTILISATION | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0673928 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 44 - line 45 * * page 18, line 44 *; | [Y]WO9528931 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 7, line 5 - line 6 ** page 28, line 8 *; | [X]WO9719926 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 19 * * page 1, line 36 *; | [X]WO9852942 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 19 * * page 1, line 36 *; | [XY]WO0031037 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim 1 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-10 | International search | [A]US6124316 (BICHON DANIEL [FR], et al) |