EP1395501 - PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR COFFEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Folger Coffee Company One Strawberry Lane Orrville, OH 44667 / US | [2012/25] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states The Folgers Coffee Company 1 Strawberry Lane Orville, OH 44667 / US | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states The Folgers Coffee Company 6210 Center Hill road Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALTON, David, Andrew 206 Pincay Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 02 /
SMITH, James, David 11820 Carter Grove Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 03 /
BONO, James, Lee 7302 Southpointe Drive Cincinnati, OH 45233 / US | 04 /
MUNGUR, Sameer 2128 Alpine Place, Apt. 4 Cincinnati, OH 45206 / US | 05 /
BARRY, Aisha 7557A Mansion Circle Mason, OH 45040 / US | 06 /
FLOYD, Jennifer, Ruth 7511 Hidden Knoll Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/08] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/11] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 02732013.4 | 03.06.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002US17413 | Priority number, date | US20010295666P | 04.06.2001 Original published format: US 295666 P | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098759 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395501 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395501 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D79/00, B65D51/20, B65D23/10, B65D21/02, B65D43/02 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
B65D51/165 (EP,US);
B65D21/0217 (EP,US);
B65D23/102 (EP,US);
B65D25/525 (EP,US);
B65D43/0212 (EP,US);
B65D51/1644 (EP,US);
B65D51/20 (EP,US);
B65D79/0084 (EP,US);
B65D79/0087 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0018 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00027 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00101 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00407 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00527 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0062 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00685 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2004/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM FÜR KAFFEE | [2004/11] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEM FOR COFFEE | [2004/11] | French: | SYSTEME D'EMBALLAGE POUR CAFE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2015 | 28.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | GR | 10.02.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | IE | 03.06.2017 | LU | 03.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 03.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/30] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH403454 (FINCKH OHG DR [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US3269588 (RUEKBERG HERBERT S) [X] 1,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3664544 (HAMMES WILHELM) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]US3821427 (ENZIE W, et al) [X] 1,7,10 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 58 *; | [A]US4378895 (WOINARSKI PETER A [AU]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [XY]US4856674 (BERNEY SHELDON [CA]) [X] 1-4,7,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,8,9; | [DA]EP0659657 (GOGLIO LUIGI [IT]) [DA] 2* the whole document *; | [A]WO9532242 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO9640570 (WEIRTON STEEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9724403 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0113407 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US]) [Y] 5,6,8,9 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 14 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]EP1146077 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [PA] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0350128 |