EP1401972 - PIGMENT PASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANS, Robertus, Jozef, Franciscus Matthijs Sterklaan 20 NL-1161 VZ Zwanenburg / NL | 02 /
DE JONG, Eugène, Michael, Arnoldus Munnikkenpark 15 NL-2351 CL Leiderdorp / NL | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | De Vries, Adriaan Jacobus, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 Velperweg 76 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2004/14] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 02732642.0 | 19.04.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002EP04351 | Priority number, date | EP20010202044 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01202044 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096997 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401972 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1401972 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00, C09B67/00, C09D167/08 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
C09D17/002 (EP);
C09B67/006 (EP);
C09B67/0063 (EP);
C09D167/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/08, C08L67/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIGMENTPASTE | [2004/14] | English: | PIGMENT PASTE | [2004/14] | French: | PATE PIGMENTAIRE | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2009
12.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE PPG B.V. PPG Research & Development Amsterdam (RDA) Oceanenweg 2 1047 BB Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/20] |
Former [2015/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2009
12.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE PPG Research & Development A'dam (RDA) Oceanenweg 2 1047BB Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2009
12.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE PPG Research & Development A'dam (RDA) Oceanenweg 2 1047BB Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Smithson, Robert Alan, et al, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | 21.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/32] | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 07.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T0970/15 | 14.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.04.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 02.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 19.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | ES | 20.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | AT | 19.04.2019 | CY | 19.04.2019 | FI | 19.04.2019 | IE | 19.04.2019 | IT | 19.04.2019 | DK | 30.04.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | GR | 05.11.2019 | [2022/16] |
Former [2022/09] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
IT | 19.04.2019 | ||
DK | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
IT | 19.04.2019 | ||
DK | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
IT | 19.04.2019 | ||
DK | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
DK | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
IE | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
GR | 05.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
AT | 19.04.2019 | ||
CY | 19.04.2019 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
FI | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
ES | 20.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2011/21] | LU | 19.04.2009 | |
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | MC | 30.04.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2361293 (BASF FARBEN + FASERN) [A] 1,9 * example 1 *; | [A]US3920597 (NICKS PETER FRANCIS, et al) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0012964 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [AD] 1,9 * abstract *; | [AD]US5158608 (SODHI JAGDIP-SINGH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 46-52 * * use example 1 *; | [A]US5645636 (SCHNEIDER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 * |