EP1425949 - PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A.Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRT, Hermann Beim Hochgericht 8 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
HEINI, Hubert Scheuereckerstr. 2 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Paul-Heinz Rietheimer Str. 4/1 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02732644.6 | 22.04.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP04382 | Priority number, date | DE2001121673 | 04.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10121673 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02091810 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425949 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425949 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/28 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
H05K3/28 (EP);
H05K1/0263 (EP);
H05K2201/0195 (EP);
H05K2201/09881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE | [2004/24] | English: | PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2004/24] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | LU | 22.04.2006 | IE | 24.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
LU | 22.04.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS53149673 ; | [A]DE2312482 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ) [A] 1,7 * figure .; claim - *; | [Y]US5090120 (MATSUMOTO MASUO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,8,10 * column 4, line 27 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US5304392 (MATSUMOTO MASUO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7; claim - *; | [A]US5316894 (TAKAHASHI HISAYA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 2; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP0805615 (EUROCIR S A [ES]) [Y] 1,2,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6210746 (CHENG DAVID C H [TW]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A] - "CONFORMAL COATING MATERIALS", ELECTRONIC PACKAGING AND PRODUCTION, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO, NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (19960201), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0013-4945, pages 33 - 34, XP000557175 [A] 2-4,6,7 * the whole document * | [A] - 30395, "THERMOCOMPRESSION BONDED HIGH DENSITY CABLE DESIGN", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19890701), no. 303, ISSN 0374-4353, page 546, XP000045872 [A] 1,6,7,9 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 06, Database accession no. 1979-11115b, XP002211295 & JPS53149673 A 19781227 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO) [A] 1 * abstract * |