EP1394665 - USER INPUT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REKIMOTO, Junichi, Sony Computer Science Lab., Inc 14-13, Higashi-Gotanda 3-chome Shinagawa-Ku, Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Goddard, Frances Anna D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Goddard, Frances Anna D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02733252.7 | 30.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002JP05257 | Priority number, date | JP20010167249 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001167249 | [2004/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099614 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394665 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/015 (EP,US);
G06F3/00 (KR);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (US);
G06F2218/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | BENUTZEREINGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2004/10] | English: | USER INPUT APPARATUS | [2004/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE SAISIE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2003 | Translation filed | 14.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 20.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07219703 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH10113343 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH11143608 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2000187553 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000221953 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2000321013 (SONY CORP) |