EP1396724 - METHOD OF ASSAY BY IMMUNOREACTION AND REAGENT FOR USE IN THE IMMUNOREACTION ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMEI, Akihito 24-5, Kinmeidaichuo Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8295 / JP | 02 /
KENJO, Noriko 7-85, Ikagakitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0036 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Tatsuro 16-20, Osumigaoka 3-chome Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0351 / JP | 04 /
HIRAI, Mahito 1-79, Okamidani Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0341 / JP | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Balsters, Robert Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2004/11] | Balsters, Robert Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02733326.9 | 05.06.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002JP05568 | Priority number, date | JP20010179710 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001179710 | JP20010368286 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001368286 | [2004/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010541 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1396724 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1396724 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/537 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | G01N33/531 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/33] |
Former [2004/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TEST-VERFAHREN DURCH IMMUNOREAKTION UND REAKTIONSMITTEL ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI EINEM IMMUNOREAKTIONSTEST | [2005/52] | English: | METHOD OF ASSAY BY IMMUNOREACTION AND REAGENT FOR USE IN THE IMMUNOREACTION ASSAY | [2004/11] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE PAR IMMUNOREACTION, ET REACTIF CORRESPONDANT | [2004/11] |
Former [2004/11] | ASSAY-VERFAHREN DURCH IMMUNOREAKTION UND REAKTIONSMITTEL ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DEM IMMUNOREAKTIONS-ASSAY | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2002 | Translation filed | 09.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | NL | 16.08.2006 | |
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4672045 (TSUTSUI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * * column 2, lines 35-40,57-60 *; | [X]WO9110911 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,13-20,23 * the whole document * * page 2, lines 23-37 * * page 5, lines 5-10 *; | [X]JPH0682450 (EIKEN CHEMICAL) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13-18,20,23* the whole document *; | [X]US5616460 (FIGARD STEVE D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13-18,20,23 * the whole document * * column 3, lines 30-41 * * column 4, lines 53-67 *; | [X]EP1061368 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0030] , [0035] , [0036] , [0042] * | International search | [Y]JPH07270413 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0236354 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0261561 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0682450 (EIKEN CHEMICAL); | [A]JPH11344494 (EIKEN CHEMICAL) |