EP1513340 - DIGITAL BROADCAST RECEIVER CAPABLE OF AUTOMATICALLY ACQUIRING ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDES OF BROADCASTING STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Yuuichirou, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02733336.8 | 06.06.2002 | [2005/10] | WO2002JP05583 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105468 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513340 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04H1/00, H04B1/16 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
H04H60/06 (EP);
H04N21/4332 (EP);
H04N21/4348 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/4351 (EP);
H04N21/4382 (EP);
H04N21/44209 (EP);
H04N21/4424 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/4586 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/39] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALRECEIVER MIT DER FÄHIGKEIT ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN BESCHAFFEN ELEKTRONISCHER PROGRAMMANLEITUNGEN VON SENDESTATIONEN | [2005/10] | English: | DIGITAL BROADCAST RECEIVER CAPABLE OF AUTOMATICALLY ACQUIRING ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDES OF BROADCASTING STATIONS | [2005/10] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE RADIODIFFUSION NUMERIQUE PERMETTANT L'ACQUISITION AUTOMATIQUE DE GUIDES ELECTRONIQUES DES PROGRAMMES DES STATIONS DE RADIODIFFUSION | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2004 | Translation filed | 29.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 20.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11150688 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1,2,4,10-13 * column W *; | [Y]WO0001213 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 8,17* page 3, line 3 - page 19, line 24 *; | [Y]EP1047266 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-8,10-13,15-17 * column 4, paragraph 17 - column 22, paragraph 163 *; | [Y]EP1063797 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [Y] 6,7,15,16 * column 7, paragraph 39 - column 21, paragraph 180 * | International search | [Y]JP2000341601 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2000013696 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH11150688 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2002142163 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2000333091 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2001054030 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |