EP1512652 - ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAGUCHI, Shuki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3,Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HONDA, Takenobu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3,Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
HASHIGUCHI, Naoki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3,Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02733444.0 | 10.06.2002 | [2005/10] | WO2002JP05741 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03104126 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512652 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512652 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/06, B66B11/08 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
B66B11/0045 (EP);
B66B11/08 (KR);
B66B11/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2005/39] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUFZUG | [2005/10] | English: | ELEVATOR | [2005/10] | French: | ASCENSEUR | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2003 | Translation filed | 18.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 02.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO0230801 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO0222486 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2001261257 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH0664863 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |