EP1350111 - DETECTION OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heska Corporation 1613 Prospect Parkway Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCALL, Catherine, A. 709 Pleasant Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 02 /
BABU, Uma, Mahesh 5627 Weeping Way Fort Collins, CO 80528 / US | 03 /
RADECKI, Steven, V. 150 North County Road 3 Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/09] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | Stevens, Ian Edward Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02733775.7 | 03.01.2002 | [2003/41] | WO2002US00324 | Priority number, date | US20010259450P | 03.01.2001 Original published format: US 259450 P | US20010325812P | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 325812 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02066602 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350111 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON ALLERGEN-SPEZIFISCHEM IGE | [2003/41] | English: | DETECTION OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IGE | [2003/41] | French: | DETECTION D'IGE SPECIFIQUE D'ALLERGENES | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 11.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3820556 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0556745 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [X]WO9429696 (QUIDEL CORP [US]); | [X]WO9720859 (IDEXX LAB INC [US]); | [X]DE19721151 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); |