11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
14.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
17.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
20.07.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
09.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
11.08.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
05.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.08.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2006 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
01.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.07.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2005 |
First examination report |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
30.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
19.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
11.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|