EP1385570 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE AND PATCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Medtronic, INC. LC 340 , 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPORTE, Steve 1646 Lake View Court Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
HALLER, Markus 2848 Webster Avenue South St. Louis, MN 55416 / US | 03 /
HOOPER, William, J. 8820 27th Street Court North Lake Elmo, MN 55042 / US | 04 /
LENT, Mark, S. 4516 Edinbrook Terrace Brooklyn Park, MN 55433 / US | 05 /
RIFF, Kenneth, M. 900 Old Crystal Bay Road Orono, MN 55391 / US | 06 /
HERUTH, Kenneth, T. 4904 Bruce Avenue Edina, MN 55424 / US | 07 /
OLSEN, James, M. 10380 51st Place North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02734124.7 | 30.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US13792 | Priority number, date | US20010287521P | 30.04.2001 Original published format: US 287521 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02087681 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1385570 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385570 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M35/00, A61N1/32, A61N1/37 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
A61N1/37235 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61M37/0092 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
A61N1/08 (EP,US);
A61N1/30 (EP,US);
A61N1/3702 (EP,US);
A61N1/37258 (EP,US);
A61N1/37288 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0271 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61N1/37217 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND KISSENELEKTRODENSYSTEM | [2004/06] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE AND PATCH SYSTEM | [2004/06] | French: | APPAREIL MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE ET SYSTEME DE TIMBRE | [2006/11] |
Former [2004/06] | APPAREIL MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE, SYSTEME DE TIMBRE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | IT | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | PT | 02.03.2007 | GB | 30.04.2007 | IE | 30.04.2007 | LU | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
GB | 30.04.2007 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
LU | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
GB | 30.04.2007 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
GB | 30.04.2007 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
GB | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 02.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4655766 (THEEUWES FELIX [US], et al) [A] 38,39,42-44,46-48 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 22; figure - *; | [AD]US4987897 (FUNKE HERMANN D [DE]) [AD] 38,39,43-48 * column 6, line 4 - column 9, line 68; figure - *; | [A]US5551953 (LATTIN GARY A [US], et al) [A] 38,39,43,44,46-48* column 4, line 9 - column 4, line 5; figure - *; | [A]US5925066 (KROLL KAI [US], et al) [A] 38-40,43-48 * column 3, line 55 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 31; figure - *; | [XA]WO0128609 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [X] 39,40,43-46,48 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 16 * * page 3, line 21 - page 8, line 6; figure - * [A] 38,47 | by applicant | US5135480 | WO9218198 | US5292338 | US5314430 | US5332400 | US5549642 | EP1022035 | US6200265 |