EP1405371 - SELF-ALIGNING POWER CONNECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITEMAN, Robert, Neil, Jr. 1031 Plane Street Middletown, PA 17057 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02734442.3 | 15.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US15452 | Priority number, date | US20010859866 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: US 859866 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02093692 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405371 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405371 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R3/00, H01R13/631 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H01R13/6315 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | H01R3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTAUSRICHTENDER LEISTUNGSSTECKVERBINDER | [2004/15] | English: | SELF-ALIGNING POWER CONNECTOR SYSTEM | [2004/15] | French: | SYSTEME CONNECTEUR D'ALIMENTATION A AUTO-ALIGNEMENT | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 12.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4653826 (BURGESS CHRISTOPHER N [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]DE19828983 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |