EP1401355 - ANTERIOR CRUCIATE LIGAMENT RECONSTRUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coapt Systems, Inc. 1820 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELSON, Robert, James 601 Bryson Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Daniel 4289 Brianwood Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Jackson, David Spence REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02734591.7 | 31.05.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002US17000 | Priority number, date | US20010295389P | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 295389 P | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02096269 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1401355 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A61F2/0805 (EP,US);
A61F2/08 (EP,US);
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0829 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0852 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0864 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0882 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0007 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0012 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR REKONSTRUKTION DES VORDEREN KREUZBANDS | [2004/14] | English: | ANTERIOR CRUCIATE LIGAMENT RECONSTRUCTION SYSTEM | [2004/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECONSTRUCTION DU LIGAMENT CROISE ANTERIEUR DU GENOU | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4772286 (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al); | [A]US6001106 (RYAN JAMES P [US], et al) |