EP1381792 - ENERGY DRAG CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGUS SPRITZGUSSTEILE FÜR DIE INDUSTRIE GmbH Spicher Strasse 1a D-51147 Köln / DE | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMEY, Andreas Annostrasse 96 53773 Hennef / DE | 02 /
BLASE, Frank Wildphal 10 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
BLASE, Günter Oberkülheim 10 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/04] | 01 /
HERMEY, Andreas Annostrasse 96 53773 Hennef / DE | ||
02 /
BLASE, Frank Goethestrasse 78 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
03 /
BLASE, Günter Oberkülheim 10 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Representative(s) | Gudat, Axel Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Gudat, Axel, Dr. Patentanwälte, Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02735042.0 | 15.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002DE01407 | Priority number, date | DE2001207003U | 23.04.2001 Original published format: DE 20107003 U | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086349 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381792 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381792 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/16 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
F16G13/16 (EP,KR,US);
H02G11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEFÜHRUNGSKETTE | [2004/04] | English: | ENERGY DRAG CHAIN | [2004/04] | French: | CHAINE DE GUIDAGE D'ELEMENTS DE TRANSPORT D'ENERGIE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 30.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04026502.7 / EP1503107 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | IE | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | SE | 12.04.2005 | CY | 15.04.2005 | LU | 15.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/04] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 15.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 15.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 15.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 15.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
IE | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 12.01.2005 | |
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0789167 (KUNIMORIKAGAKU LTD [JP]); | [D]EP0803032 (IGUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5980409 (BLASE GUENTER [DE]) |