EP1360245 - ADHESIVES FOR METAL-POLYMER COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M ESPE AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states 3M Espe AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖBEL, Roland Heimstättenstrasse 12 07759 Jena / DE | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/46] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02735102.2 | 25.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002EP00798 | Priority number, date | DE2001103586 | 26.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10103586 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072711 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360245 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360245 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D183/08, A61K6/093 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP,US);
C09D183/08, C08L2666/44 (US,EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/20 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAFTVERMITTLER FÜR METALL-POLYMER-VERBUNDE | [2003/46] | English: | ADHESIVES FOR METAL-POLYMER COMPOSITES | [2003/46] | French: | AGENTS ADHESIFS POUR COMPOSITES METAL-POLYMERE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.07.2004 | IE | 14.07.2004 | IT | 14.07.2004 | NL | 14.07.2004 | TR | 14.07.2004 | DK | 14.10.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | SE | 14.10.2004 | ES | 25.10.2004 | PT | 14.12.2004 | CY | 25.01.2005 | LU | 25.01.2005 | AT | 31.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IT | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
CY | 25.01.2005 | ||
LU | 25.01.2005 | ||
AT | 31.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IT | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
CY | 25.01.2005 | ||
LU | 25.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
CY | 25.01.2005 | ||
LU | 25.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
LU | 25.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
TR | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
NL | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
IE | 14.07.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 14.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4233428 (ENDO ISAO) [Y] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4269991 (HOMAN GARY R, et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0124865 (SWS SILICONES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * claim 1 * |