EP1395716 - EXTRUDED CONNECTING PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilltech Holdings S.A. 70, Grand'Rue, B.P. 761 2017 Luxembourg / LU | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAAC, Eric 4, Gappenhiehl L-5335 Moutfort / LU | 02 /
CORTIVO, Paolo Via Bertolini, 28 I-31100 Treviso / IT | 03 /
POLLONI, Piergiorgio Via Alzaia, 57 I-31100 Treviso / IT | 04 /
GABRIEL, Stefano Via Ottavi I-31100 Treviso / IT | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/11] | 01 /
ISAAC, Eric 4, Gappenhiehl L-5335 Moutfort / LU | ||
02 /
CORTIVO, Paolo Via Bertolini, 28 I-31100 Treviso / IT | |||
03 /
POLLONI, Piergiorgio Via Alzaia, 57 I-31100 Treviso / IT | |||
04 /
GABRIEL, Stefano V. le Nino Bixio, 23 I-31100 Treviso / IT | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 02735170.9 | 23.03.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002EP03293 | Priority number, date | LU20010090786 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: LU 90786 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02101165 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395716 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395716 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/74 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
E04B2/7401 (EP,US);
E04B2/7453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRUDIERTES VERBINDUNGSPROFIL | [2004/11] | English: | EXTRUDED CONNECTING PROFILE | [2004/11] | French: | PROFILE DE LIAISON EXTRUDE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | CH | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | LI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | IE | 23.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/12] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
IE | 23.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5203640 (POURTAU JEAN-JACQUES [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * column 3, line 21 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0644337 (HOLDING DURANCE LUBERON S A R [FR]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 6 - line 13; figures 5,6,9 * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9532343 (BOON KAREL WILLEM [CA]) [X] 1,4 * page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 5 * * page 11, line 7 - line 19 * * page 18, line 4 - line 17; figures 13,4A,4B,5A; claims 8-10 * [A] 7,10; | [A]DE29700361U (HPP PROFILE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE29809264U (FLATTENHUTTER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-4; claim 1 * |