EP1392680 - SELECTIVE ANTHRANILAMIDE PYRIDINE AMIDES AS INHIBITORS OF VEGFR-2 AND VEGFR-3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERNST, Alexander Gellertpark 7 4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
HUTH, Andreas Eichbuschallee 1 12437 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KRÜGER, Martin Heerufer Weg 7a 13465 Berlin / DE | 04 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 14469 Berlin / DE | 05 /
MENRAD, Andreas Allerstrasse 7 16515 Oranienburg / DE | 06 /
HABEREY, Martin Steinstrasse 1 12169 Berlin / DE | [2004/16] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
ERNST, Alexander Ansbacher Str. 60 10777 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
HUTH, Andreas Eichbuschallee 1 12437 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
KRÜGER, Martin Heerufer Weg 7a 13465 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 14469 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
MENRAD, Andreas Allerstrasse 7 16515 Oranienburg / DE | |||
06 /
HABEREY, Martin Steinstrasse 1 12169 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02735333.3 | 03.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002EP04924 | Priority number, date | DE2001123574 | 08.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10123574 | DE2001125294 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10125294 | DE2001164590 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10164590 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02090352 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392680 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392680 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D401/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/14, A61K31/47, A61K31/44, A61P29/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE ANTHRANYLAMIDPYRIDINAMIDE ALS VEGFR-2 UND VEGFR-3 INHIBITOREN | [2004/10] | English: | SELECTIVE ANTHRANILAMIDE PYRIDINE AMIDES AS INHIBITORS OF VEGFR-2 AND VEGFR-3 | [2004/10] | French: | ANTHRANYLAMIDES PYRIDINE AMIDES SELECTIVES EN TANT QU'INHIBATEURS VEGFR-2 ET VEGFR-3 | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IE | 22.07.2009 | IT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | DK | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 22.07.2009 | |
ES | 02.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0686625 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]WO0027819 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1; examples 2.1-2.82; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0027820 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-12 * Beispiele *; | [PX]WO0155114 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-12 * examples 2,3,6,8-23 *; | [PX]WO0185715 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-12 * examples 1.1-2.0 * |