EP1403412 - NON-WOVEN FABRIC AND,LAMINATE AND STRING USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Seigo, Yodogawa W. of DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Katsutoshi, Yodogawa W of DAIKIN IND.Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
ASANO, Jun, Yodogawa W. of DAIKIN IND. Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 04 /
CHAEN, Shinichi, Yodogawa W. of DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 05 /
KONISHI, Tomohisa, Yodogawa W. of DAIKIN IND. Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02736141.9 | 17.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002JP06028 | Priority number, date | JP20010188807 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001188807 | [2004/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000977 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403412 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/42, D04H1/46, D04H13/00 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/4318 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/49 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | D04H1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | VLIESSTOFF, LAMINAT UND ENTSPRECHENDER FADEN | [2004/14] | English: | NON-WOVEN FABRIC AND,LAMINATE AND STRING USING THE SAME | [2004/14] | French: | TISSU NON TISSE ET LAMINE ET FICELLE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2003 | Translation filed | 19.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 23.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0716175 (AUSIMONT USA [US]) [X] 1,5,8,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]US5646076 (BORTZ DAVID N [US]) [A] 1,2,5,8,9,12* the whole document *; | [XA]EP1050608 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 | International search | [X]WO9610668 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9423098 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO9610662 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000042126 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH0913258 (TORAY FINECHEMICALS CO LTD) |